true

Find the best tutors and institutes for Vedic Maths Training

Find Best Vedic Maths Training classes

Please select a Category.

Please select a Locality.

No matching category found.

No matching Locality found.

Outside India?

Search for topics

To find the square of a 2 digit number ending in 5 in 3 seconds

Somnath Nag
31 Mar 0 0

Let us take a 2 digit number ending in 5 i.e 45

Now (45)²

Step 1: multiply the digit at tens place by a number 1 greater than that i.e.4*5 =20

Step 2: write 25 after the multiplication i.e. 2025

Hence,(45)² =2025

Lets try it with a different two digit number ending in 5 i.e. 65

(65)²= (6*7)/25=4225 (done in 3 seconds or may be lesser than that)

Hope you enjoyed

Now try to do it with 

1)85

2)55

0 Dislike
Follow 1

Please Enter a comment

Submit

Other Lessons for You

Mathematics
Vedic Mathematics Vedic Mathematics is a Mathematical elaboration of “sixteen simple Mathematical formulae from the Vedas”. As brought out by “Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji.” This...

Kavya K N | 14 May

0 0
0

Trigonometry
In trigonometry generally, we use the right angle triangle why ?? It is because you are standing on a road facing the opposite side of a building. Mark the points * standing place * building bottom...

Lumina | 29 Apr

0 0
0

Easy Math Tricks - Squaring number ending with 5
Have you felt that squaring a number is the tedious process? Well, not at least for numbers ending with 5. Here I present a simple trick which helps you calculate the squares of 2 digit and 3 digit numbers...

Nikhil Chandra Gayam | 24/12/2019

0 0
0

How fast are you?
9999 x 9999 235 x 235 777 x 777 102x102x102 978x978 Do you know the techniques are lying in logical math? Any question of this sought, If you know, any of them, please reply and get appreciation. And...

Rakesh Kumar Sharma | 29/08/2019

0 0
0

Multiplication of 2 digit numbers
Multiply 2 digit number ended with 5 Example 25*25 Step 1- multiply 5*5 and write it on a paper Step2-multiply 2*2 and then add the same number 2 one times i.e 2*2=4 , 4 + 2 =6 Step 3 - 625 is the answer

Namita | 15/08/2019

0 0
0

Looking for Vedic Maths Training classes?

Find best Vedic Maths Training classes in your locality on UrbanPro.

Are you a Tutor or Training Institute?

Join UrbanPro Today to find students near you
Sponsored
X

Looking for Vedic Maths Training Classes?

Find best tutors for Vedic Maths Training Classes by posting a requirement.

  • Post a learning requirement
  • Get customized responses
  • Compare and select the best

Looking for Vedic Maths Training Classes?

Find best Vedic Maths Training Classes in your locality on UrbanPro

Post your learning requirement

UrbanPro.com is India's largest network of most trusted tutors and institutes. Over 25 lakh students rely on UrbanPro.com, to fulfill their learning requirements across 1,000+ categories. Using UrbanPro.com, parents, and students can compare multiple Tutors and Institutes and choose the one that best suits their requirements. More than 6.5 lakh verified Tutors and Institutes are helping millions of students every day and growing their tutoring business on UrbanPro.com. Whether you are looking for a tutor to learn mathematics, a German language trainer to brush up your German language skills or an institute to upgrade your IT skills, we have got the best selection of Tutors and Training Institutes for you. Read more