Learn Vedic Maths Training from the Best Tutors

• Affordable fees
• 1-1 or Group class
• Flexible Timings
• Verified Tutors

Search in

# Hey, what is to be done if my profile says I am a tutor instead a learner?

report to urban pro

Quicker Maths

Modify it.

MATH BEST

no

Like to train students & bring out the best out of them

go to account - edit profile

edit

Related Questions

how to be master in mathematics

As the old proverb says "Practice makes a man perfect". Becoming a Master in Mathematics is no different either. However to achieve that a good mentor plays an important role too who can give you guidance...
Samarth
How can you teach 7-8 year old kid to learn/memorize tables. Since kids these days are taught logic of addition and arriving at the multiplication result, they are reluctant to memorize the tables.
you do not need to make them memorise tables, instead help them understand the logic behind the numbers, table learning will happen automatically.
Meenakshi
Do you know how to solve 234 x 456 x 432 multiplication in one line method / Vedic Method? If yes, explain...
you can use polynomial multiplication (2x^2 + 3x +4)(4x^2 + 5x+ 6)(4x^2 + 3x+2)....Vedic maths is nothing but a clever use of algebra after all
Genius Abacus and Vedic Maths
Thanks to all for sparing their time and responding to my query. We have recently shifted to Noida. In case anyone knows a Vedic maths center near sector-50 where she can learn the technique it will be really helpful.
With due respect to all the vedic maths teachers and academies, the class taker shall not be under any false impression that vedic maths will help speed up calculations. Calculations can be speeded up...
Meenakshi
What is Binomial Theoram.. What is its use in real life?
Binomial theorem is useful method in expanding the power (a+b)^n in to the sums. It is useful in nations economic prediction.Economists used binomial theorem to count probabilities that depend on numerous...
Venkat

Now ask question in any of the 1000+ Categories, and get Answers from Tutors and Trainers on UrbanPro.com

Related Lessons

With Vedic tricks and Methods, do the following questions. There are specific Sutras for each of the questions.
4759 + 352 =? 10000 – 6182 =? 106 x 102 = ? 91 X 103 = ? 52 X 43 = ? 364 X 712 = ? 8756439 X 9999999 = ? 2476 X 8124 =? 76493 ÷ 63 =? 91354 ÷ 521 = ? 83152 ÷ 62719 = ?

The Vedic Way of Calculations

Vedic Mathematics for finding square of a number whose unit place carries 5
As we learned from my previous lesson i,e; (In case of two 2-digited numbers whose digits in 10's place are same and sum of the digits in unit places is 10 For example:- 38 and 32 (10's place digits...
N

Naimish K.

Multiplication of 2 digit numbers
Multiply 2 digit number ended with 5 Example 25*25 Step 1- multiply 5*5 and write it on a paper Step2-multiply 2*2 and then add the same number 2 one times i.e 2*2=4 , 4 + 2 =6 Step 3 - 625 is the answer

Vedic Math Division: Case 1
4 8 7 1 0 :8 8 0 3 7 2 -4 0 -12 -28 3 31 58 0 1 0 3 7 0 Quotient Remainder Case...

Ajinkya Anant Jawalkar

Looking for Vedic Maths Training classes?

Learn from the Best Tutors on UrbanPro

Are you a Tutor or Training Institute?

Join UrbanPro Today to find students near you
X

### Looking for Vedic Maths Training Classes?

The best tutors for Vedic Maths Training Classes are on UrbanPro

• Select the best Tutor
• Book & Attend a Free Demo
• Pay and start Learning

### Learn Vedic Maths Training with the Best Tutors

The best Tutors for Vedic Maths Training Classes are on UrbanPro