Find the best tutors and institutes for Vedic Maths Training

Find Best Vedic Maths Training classes

Please select a Category.

Please select a Locality.

No matching category found.

No matching Locality found.

Outside India?

Search for topics

Do you know how to solve 234 x 456 x 432 multiplication in one line method / Vedic Method? If yes, explain...

Asked by Last Modified  

Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Follow 0
Answer

9 Answers

Please enter your answer

Tutor

you can use polynomial multiplication (2x^2 + 3x +4)(4x^2 + 5x+ 6)(4x^2 + 3x+2)....Vedic maths is nothing but a clever use of algebra after all
Comments

Tutor

vertically and crosswise method is nothing but polynomial multiplication in hindsight
Comments

Trainer

vertically and crosswise method to be used..since you want to multiply three numbers you need to take three variables in each steps
Comments

MBA in Finance. Teaching is self esteemed job.

vertically crosswise
Comments

Like to train students & bring out the best out of them

46096128....
Comments

Vivek Sir, will you explain how to get answer 234 x 456 x 432=46096128 step-by-step using polynomial multiplication...?
Comments

Use vertically cross wise.
Comments

using vertically and cross wise method we can solve this problem.
Comments

Maths Tutor

By vertical crosswise and Base method
Comments

View 7 more Answers

Related Lessons

How fast are you?
9999 x 9999 235 x 235 777 x 777 102x102x102 978x978 Do you know the techniques are lying in logical math? Any question of this sought, If you know, any of them, please reply and get appreciation. And...

Multiplication of 2 digit numbers
Multiply 2 digit number ended with 5 Example 25*25 Step 1- multiply 5*5 and write it on a paper Step2-multiply 2*2 and then add the same number 2 one times i.e 2*2=4 , 4 + 2 =6 Step 3 - 625 is the answer

Namita | 15 Aug

0 0
0

Multiply faster using "Vedic Ganit" technique
I will explain a simple and fastest process of multiplication. This can help you to get answers faster. Let's assume you have to multiply 9999 X 2456. Now think how much time it will take? Maybe 30...

Ritesh Rai | 18/04/2018

1 0
0

Recommended Articles

Abacus is basically a device which is used extensively for calculating simple arithmetical problems. This traditional device is being used by humans for several centuries. The simplicity of tool has lead to several civilizations to construct similar arithmetical devices with variations design. By using abacus method one...

Read full article >

Origins of Vedic Maths Vedic Maths tracks its origin to the Vedas which were ancient scripts (texts) for knowledge and wisdom. Primarily Atharavaveda which is one of the Vedas is known to have details of Vedic Maths origins. Vedic Maths was made more popular by Vedic Guru Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji in between...

Read full article >

You might be a class monitor, college representative or team lead in office. Being at the lead position where a group of people looks up to you is not easy. Leadership might look heavenly from others point of view, but in reality, it has many challenges. From performance of the team to achieve impossible targets - a leader...

Read full article >

Swimming has the healing power of almost all the stress. It is one of the best physical exercises that contains multiple forms of workout. In fact, easy swim per hour burns almost 500 calories, since water density is greatest and it s nearly 800 times denser than air. On the other hand, practically it has proven that,...

Read full article >

Looking for Vedic Maths Training classes?

Find best Vedic Maths Training classes in your locality on UrbanPro.

Are you a Tutor or Training Institute?

Join UrbanPro Today to find students near you

Find Best Vedic Maths Training classes?

Find Now »

UrbanPro.com is India's largest network of most trusted tutors and institutes. Over 25 lakh students rely on UrbanPro.com, to fulfill their learning requirements across 1,000+ categories. Using UrbanPro.com, parents, and students can compare multiple Tutors and Institutes and choose the one that best suits their requirements. More than 6.5 lakh verified Tutors and Institutes are helping millions of students every day and growing their tutoring business on UrbanPro.com. Whether you are looking for a tutor to learn mathematics, a German language trainer to brush up your German language skills or an institute to upgrade your IT skills, we have got the best selection of Tutors and Training Institutes for you. Read more