Find the best tutors and institutes for Vedic Maths Training

Find Best Vedic Maths Training classes

Please select a Category.

Please select a Locality.

No matching category found.

No matching Locality found.

Outside India?

Search for topics

Vedic Maths Training Updates

Ask a Question

Post a Lesson

All

All

Lessons

Discussion

Answered on 25 May Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Paramita

Tutor

5000
Answers 5 Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 18/04/2018 CBSE/Class 1/Maths Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training CBSE/Class 2/Maths/Mental Mathematics +1 CBSE/Class 10/Mathematics less

Multiply faster using "Vedic Ganit" technique

Ritesh

I will explain a simple and fastest process of multiplication. This can help you to get answers faster. Let's assume you have to multiply 9999 X 2456. Now think how much time it will take? Maybe 30 sec. or 50 sec. or more as well.. Now try this: 9999 x 2456 --------------- 24557544 ... read more

I will explain a simple and fastest process of multiplication. This can help you to get answers faster.

 

Let's assume you have to multiply 9999 X 2456.

Now think how much time it will take? Maybe 30 sec. or 50 sec. or more as well.. 

 

Now try this:

    9999

 x 2456

---------------

24557544

 

I didn't use any calculator. let me explain the steps.

Step 1. Subtract 6 (last number) from 10 = 4 (10-6)

Step 2. Rest numbers you can subtract from 9, so (9-5) , (9-4) , (9-2) = 4 , 5 , 7

Step 3. Now subtract 1 from 2456 = 2457

Step 4. You got the answer. i.e 2457 754 4

 

This is just a small example and this will only work if you have one multiplier with 9's only. I know you won't get always similar but for other, there is a different rule. I hope i will get another quick lesson for that. Or reach me to learn this types of tricks which can make your life easy. 

read less
Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 19/09/2017 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training Tuition/Class I-V Tuition Exam Coaching/Math Olympiad

Subtraction Of Numbers In An Easy Method

Mamta Mund

I have more than 5 years of experience in teaching maths. Now I m working as subject matter expert for...

As we know in decimal system ten digits are used. I.e 0 - 9. Subtracting a number from base 10, 100, 1000. An easy way to calculate is just subtracting all digits of a digit from 9 and last digit by 10.For an example, subtracting 56 from 100: 100 - 56 = (9 - 5) | (10 - 6) = 44Let's check it using... read more

As we know in decimal system ten digits are used. I.e 0 - 9. Subtracting a number from base 10, 100, 1000. An easy way to calculate is just subtracting all digits of a digit from 9 and last digit by 10.

For an example, subtracting 56 from 100:

    100 - 56 = (9 - 5) | (10 - 6) = 44

Let's check it using our conventional method, in units place it is 6 there. So carry from tens place, there also 0, so so take carry from hundred places, I.e in units place has value 10 so subtracting 6 from 10 we get 4 and now in tens place there is digit 9. Now subtract 5 from 9 we get 9 - 5 = 4. So our answer is 44. So lengthy using carry.

If we use the first method we have to do just only subtract 9 from all digits and last digit from 10. This is one of the powerful sutra "All From 9 And Last From 10" Of Vedic Mathematics. We also know that complement of 56 is 44. As if we add 56 with 44 we get 100.

Next, try for subtracting 65 from 10000:

10000 - 65 = 10000 - 0065 = 9935.


read less
Comments 2
Dislike Bookmark

Looking for Vedic Maths Training classes

Find best Vedic Maths Training classes in your locality on UrbanPro.

FIND NOW

Lesson Posted on 17/07/2017 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Vedic Math Division: Case 4

Ajinkya

14 23 2 9 9 :8 9 5 3 3 3 1 3 -4 -21 -23 -15 -12 28 18 16 3 27 4 5 3 3 5 6 Quotient Steps: 1.) Place a colon two digits from the right since we now have... read more
  14 23 2 9 9 :8 9      
5     3 3 3 1 3      
      -4 -21 -23 -15 -12      
      28 18 16 3 27      
    4 5 3 3 5 6      
    Quotient

 Steps:

1.) Place a colon two digits from the right since we now have two digits in flag.

2.) Divide 23 by 5 to get quotient as 4 and remainder as 3.

3.) Carry the remainder 3 to the next digit 2 and get 32 as gross dividend.

4.) Now, since there are 2 digits in the flag we will use 2 quotient digits in the flag, we will use 2 quotient digits from the previous two colums to carry out a cross multiplication with the 2 digits of the flag. We will then substract the result from the gross dividend to compute the next dividend.

5.) Since the quotient 4 has only one digit we pad it with a zero on the left and multiply the quotient 04 by the flag 14 as follows:

1  4

0  4

4 x 0 + 1 x 4 = 4

6.) We will subtract 4 from gross dividend 32 to get 28 as net divided.

7.) Divide 28 by 5 to get the quotient as 5 and remainder as 3.

8.) Carry the remainder 3 to the next digit 9 and get 39 as gross dividend.

9.) Now the previous two quotient digits are 4 and 5 which are multiplied by the flag 14 as follows:

1  4

4  5

1 x 5 + 4 X 4 = 21 we will substract 21 from the gross divident 39 to get 18 as net dividend.

Repeat the process for remaining columns.

 

read less
Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 17/07/2017 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Vedic Math Division: Case 5

Ajinkya

524 6 8 5 1 :2 3 5 6 0 3 3 2 6 8 -5 -2 -29 -10 -25 3 33 2 12 38 1 0 5 0 1 5 Quotient Steps: 1.) Place alon 3 digits from the right since now ther are 3 digits... read more
  524 6 8 5 1 :2 3 5    
6     0 3 3 2 6 8    
      -5 -2 -29 -10 -25      
      3 33 2 12 38      
    1 0 5 0 1 5      
    Quotient

Steps:

1.) Place alon 3 digits from the right since now ther are 3 digits in the flag.

2.) Divide 6 by 6 to get quotient as 1 and remainder as 0.

3.) Carry the remainder 0 to the next digit 8 and get 08 as gross dividend

4.) since there are three digits in the flag we will use 3quotient digits from the 3 immediately previous columns and carry out a cross multiplication with the 3digits of the flag. We will then substract the resultfrom the gross dividend to compute the net dividend.

5.) Since the quotient 1 has only one digit, we will pad it with two zeroes on the left and multiply the quotient 001 by the flag 524 as follows.

5  2  4

0  0  1

4 x 0 + 5 x 1 + 2 x 0 = 5

We will substract 5 from gross dividend 8 to get 3 as net divdend.

6.) Divide 3 by 6 to get quotient as 0 and remainder as 3.

7.) Carry the remainder 3 to the next digit 5 to get 35 as gross dividend.

8.) Now the previous two quotient digits are 0 and 1, we pad them with one zero and multiply by the flag 524 as follows

5  2  4

0  1  0

4 x 0 + 5 x 0 + 2 x 1 = 2

We will substract 2 from the gross dividend 35 to get 33 as net dividend.

9.) Divide 33 by 6 to get the quotient as 5 and remainder as 3.

10.) Carry the remainder 3 to the next digit 1 and get 31 as gross dividend.

11.) Now the previous 3 quotuients are 1 , 0 and 5. We multiply by the flag 524 as follows.

5  2  4

1  0  5

4 x 1 + 2 x 0 +5 x 5 = 29

We will substract 29 from gross dividend 31 and get 2 as the net dividend.

Repeat the process for the remaining columns.

read less
Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 15/07/2017 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Vedic Math Division: Case 3

Ajinkya

7 25 3 8 :2 0 0 0 7 4 8 11 7 7 7 -21 -14 -63 -42 -21 42 22 74 49 28 49 28 3 2 9 6 3 6 3 Quotient Case 3: Division with adjustments. Steps: 1.) Place a colon one... read more
  7 25 3 8 :2 0 0 0    
7     4 8 11 7 7 7    
      -21 -14 -63 -42 -21 42    
      22 74 49 28 49 28    
    3 2 9 6 3 6 3    
    Quotient

Case 3: Division with adjustments.

Steps:

1.) Place a colon one digit from the right (= number of digits of flag)

2.) Divide 25 by 7 to get quotient as 3 and remainder as 4.

3.) Carry the remainder 4 to the next digit 3 and get 43 as gross dividend.

4.) Multiply the quotient 3 by the flag to get 21 and substract it from 43 to get 22 as net dividend.

5.) Divide 22 by 7 to get quotient as 3 and remainder as 1.

6.) Carry the remainder 1 to the next digit 8 and get 18 as gross dividednd.

7.) Multiply the quotient 3 by 7 to get 21 and subtract it from 18 to get -3 as net dividend.

8.) Now we have a negative net dividend.The process cannot go further with this. so we have to make an adjustment.

9.) We will go one step backward and instead of writing the quotient as 3 while dividing 22 by 7 we will write down only 2 as the quotient and carry forward a bigger remainder of 8 (i.e. 22-2x7).

10.) Carry the remainder 8 to the next digit 8 and get 88 as gross dividend

11.) Multiply the quotient 2 by the flag 7 to get 14 and substract it from 88 to get 74 as net dividend which is now positive.

Carry out the process in the remaining columns, making an adjustment whenever the net divident is negative.

The final answer is 329 and remainder 49 or in decimal form, it is 329.6363.

read less
Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 14/07/2017 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training CBSE/Class 6/Maths/Playing With Numbers/Divisibility Test

Vedic Math Division: Case 1

Ajinkya

4 8 7 1 0 :8 8 0 3 7 2 -4 0 -12 -28 3 31 58 0 1 0 3 7 0 Quotient Remainder Case 1 : Division of a number with a flag of one digit (no remainder) Steps: 1.) Place a colon one digit... read more
  4 8 7 1 0 :8
8     0 3 7 2
      -4 0 -12 -28
      3 31 58 0
    1 0 3 7 0
    Quotient Remainder

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

Case 1 : Division of a number with a flag of one digit (no remainder)

Steps:

1.) Place a colon one digit from right (= number of digits of flag).

2.) Divide 8 by 8 to get quotient as 1 and remainder as o.Carry the remainder 0 to the next digit 7 and get 7 ( called gross dividend, GD).

3.) Multiply the quotient 1 by the flag 4 to get 4 and subtract it from 7 to get 3 (called net dividend, ND).

4.) Divide 3 by 8 to get quotient as 0 and remainder as 3.

5.) Carry the remainder 3 to the next digit and get 31 as GD.

6.) Multiply the quotient 0 by the flag 4 to get 0 and subtract it from 31 to get 31 as ND.

7.) Divide 31 by 8 to get quotient as 3 and remainder as 7.

8.) Carry the remainder 7 to the next digit 0 and get 70.

9.) Multiply the quotient 3 by the flag 4 to get 12 and substract it from 70 to get 58.

10.) Divide 58 by 8 to get the quotient as 7 and reaminder as 2.

11.) At this point we have obtained the integer part of the final quotient as we have reached the colon.All the balance digits would be the decimal part.

12.) Carry the remainder 2 to the next digit 8 and get 28.

13.) Multiply the quotient 7 by flag 4 to get 28 and substract it from 28 to get 0.

14.) Since the difference is now 0 the division is completed and we get the answer as 1037.

read less
Comments
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 28/02/2017 Tuition/Class IX-X Tuition Tuition/Class XI-XII Tuition (PUC) Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Vedic Mathematics for Multiplication of two 2-digited numbers

Naimish

Vedic Mathematics is a very powerful tool for us to get quick calculations For Multiplication of two 2-digited numbers, we can follow FOIL technique. If you want to multiply 74×36(let's present it as ab×cd) Find 7×3×100=2100 (a×c×100)----------multiply First... read more

 

Vedic Mathematics is a very powerful tool for us to get quick calculations

For Multiplication of two 2-digited numbers, we can follow FOIL technique.

If you want to multiply 74×36(let's present it as ab×cd)

Find 7×3×100=2100    (a×c×100)----------multiply First to first digits-----F

Find  (4×3+ 7×6)×10=540  [(bc+ad)×10]----------multiply outside and inside digits and multiply their sum with 10-----OI

Find 4×6=24     ( b×d) -------multiply last to last----------L

Add all  2100                                                                                                                                         + 540                                                                                                                                         +   24                                                                                                                                ____________                                                                                                                                     2664 

That's the product.                                                                                                                          

 

read less
Comments 2
Dislike Bookmark

Lesson Posted on 28/02/2017 Tuition/Class IX-X Tuition Tuition/Class XI-XII Tuition (PUC) Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Vedic Mathematics for Multiplication of two 2-digited special numbers

Naimish

In case of two 2-digited numbers whose digits in 10's place are same and sum of the digits in unit places is 10 For example:- 38 and 32 (10's place digits are equal and 8+2=10) 38×32 can be found very easily 3×(3+1)×100=1200 (the number in 10's place × next number tio it×100 8×2... read more

In case of two 2-digited numbers whose digits in 10's place are same and sum of the digits in unit places is 10

For example:-  38 and 32  (10's place digits are equal and 8+2=10)

38×32 can be found very easily

3×(3+1)×100=1200   (the number in 10's place × next number tio it×100

8×2  =16  (product of digits in unit places) add the result and get the product

38×32=1200+25=1225

That's the result.                                                                                                                          

read less
Comments 2
Dislike Bookmark

Looking for Vedic Maths Training classes

Find best Vedic Maths Training classes in your locality on UrbanPro.

FIND NOW

Answered on 24/05/2016 Life Skills Coaching/Vedic Maths Training

Mamta D.

Certified Vedic Maths Trainer

Abacus is limited. Vedic maths is unlimited. Abacus is more about addition subtraction. Whereas Vedic maths trains you in everything like addition subtraction, multiplication division, squares, square root, cube root..so on.. Vedic mathematics can be taught to the kid as small as 8 yrs old..
Answers 17 Comments
Dislike Bookmark

About UrbanPro

UrbanPro.com helps you to connect with the best Vedic Maths Training classes in India. Post Your Requirement today and get connected.

Overview

Questions 31

Lessons 21

Total Shares  

+ Follow 14,515 Followers

Top Contributors

Connect with Expert Tutors & Institutes for Vedic Maths Training

x

Ask a Question

Please enter your Question

Please select a Tag

UrbanPro.com is India's largest network of most trusted tutors and institutes. Over 25 lakh students rely on UrbanPro.com, to fulfill their learning requirements across 1,000+ categories. Using UrbanPro.com, parents, and students can compare multiple Tutors and Institutes and choose the one that best suits their requirements. More than 6.5 lakh verified Tutors and Institutes are helping millions of students every day and growing their tutoring business on UrbanPro.com. Whether you are looking for a tutor to learn mathematics, a German language trainer to brush up your German language skills or an institute to upgrade your IT skills, we have got the best selection of Tutors and Training Institutes for you. Read more